California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB355 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2023

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2023

Amended

Bill June 19, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023