|
07/15/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 84, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 6076.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4628.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E. D. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and B., P. & E. D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 3850.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|