California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB42 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 5, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2023

Amended

Bill August 21, 2023
Bill August 14, 2023
Bill June 21, 2023
Bill June 8, 2023
Bill April 18, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023
Bill March 30, 2023