|
10/13/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 804, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3349.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2636.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2023
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2023
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2023
|
Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2023
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1827.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 1. Page 1359.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|