|
07/21/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 84, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
07/21/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2023
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1915.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2023
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1178.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|