California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB454 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2023

Enrolled

Bill July 7, 2023

Chaptered

Bill July 21, 2023

Amended

Bill March 20, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023