California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB498 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2023

Chaptered

Bill May 22, 2023

Amended

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill April 3, 2023
Bill March 2, 2023