California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB5 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 5, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2023

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2023

Amended

Bill September 1, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Bill April 17, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023