California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB57 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 6, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2023

Amended

Bill September 6, 2023
Bill June 20, 2023
Bill May 18, 2023