|
10/11/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 745, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 14. Page 3483.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 2720.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 18. Page 2121.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1850.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|