California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB572 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2023

Amended

Bill September 8, 2023
Bill July 10, 2023
Bill May 26, 2023
Bill April 5, 2023