Assembly
|
02/12/2024
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2024
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
10/07/2023
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 3534.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2731.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2479.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 2479.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2061.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|