California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB620 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2023

Amended

Bill September 8, 2023
Bill September 1, 2023
Bill June 20, 2023
Bill April 27, 2023