|
10/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 451, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 2358.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 5. Page 1589.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1521.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|