Assembly | 02/01/2024 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2024 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.) | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2023 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2023 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 26). | ||
Assembly | 03/27/2023 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Com. on U. & E. | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2023 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2023 | Read first time. To print. |