Senate | 09/01/2023 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 07/10/2023 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/28/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1992.) | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2023 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2023 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2023 | Read first time. To print. |