|
09/30/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 269, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2023
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 3. Page 2392.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 1483.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1297.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (March 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|