Assembly | 02/01/2024 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2024 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2023 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (February 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/02/2023 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2023 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 12/16/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 15. | ||
Assembly | 12/15/2022 | Introduced. To print. |