Assembly
|
01/29/2024
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2024
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
10/08/2023
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3532.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2023
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (September 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3011.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2397.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2023
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10c.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2023
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2023
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Ochoa Bogh.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 1008.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (March 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|