California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB782 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2023

Amended

Bill August 21, 2023
Bill June 27, 2023
Bill June 19, 2023