|
09/27/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 674, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 10.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2024
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2024
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 10.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 6. Page 3967.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/25/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 3933.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2024
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2024
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Bonta.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Bonta.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|