California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB846 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2024

Amended

Bill August 23, 2024
Bill August 15, 2024
Bill June 26, 2024
Bill June 10, 2024
Bill January 25, 2024
Bill March 9, 2023