|
09/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 169, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2023
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2140.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1883.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|