|
10/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 550, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2367.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1600.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2023
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|