|
09/24/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 528, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4931.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 3884.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/17/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/16/2024
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/16/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/16/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2023
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2023
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|