California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB960 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill August 14, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2024

Amended

Bill June 27, 2024
Bill June 6, 2024
Bill May 6, 2024
Bill January 12, 2024
Bill March 20, 2023