|
09/29/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 937, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 3945.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/10/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (January 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2023
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|