California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB977 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2024

Amended

Bill August 19, 2024
Bill January 10, 2024
Bill March 15, 2023