|
10/13/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 821, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2823.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2180.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1886.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|