California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB979 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2023

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 13, 2023

Amended

Bill August 14, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023