Assembly | 09/14/2023 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Bryan. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18). | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2023 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2023 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2023 | Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2023 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2023 | Read first time. To print. |