03/04/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 15, Statutes of 2024. | |||
03/04/2024 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 02/26/2024 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3210.) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 09/06/2023 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 09/05/2023 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2937.) | ||
Assembly | 09/05/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 08/31/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 31). | ||
Assembly | 08/24/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/24/2023 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 08/23/2023 | Introduced. To print. |