1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 115 CHAPTER 15 Relative to disc golf. [ Filed with Secretary of State March 04, 2024. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 115, Waldron. Disc golf.This measure would recognize the month of August 2023 as Disc Golf Month, and August 5, 2023, as California Disc Golf Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, In the 1920s, the earliest known games of disc golf were played by children at Bladworth Elementary School in Saskatchewan, Canada; andWHEREAS, In 1965, George Sappenfield was attending California State University, Fresno, and working as a recreation counselor with a new idea of playing golf with Frisbees; andWHEREAS, On August 2, 1974, the American Flying Disc Open was launched and a group of avid golfers turned the City of Rochester Disc Golf Championship into a national tournament. They offered a prize for the winner to gain the attention of the Frisbee community; andWHEREAS, In 1975, the first official disc golf course was installed by American toy inventor Ed Headrick at Oak Grove Park in the City of Pasadena, California, where the targets are simply permanent poles; andWHEREAS, In 1976, the success of disc golf at the World Frisbee Championships suggested that this sport was the next big thing, and Ed Headrick created the Disc Golf Association (DGA). Even today, it functions as a leader in the sport; andWHEREAS, This sport is so popular and rapidly growing that there are 11,300 courses globally, with 75 percent of all disc golf courses being in the United States, and over 400 courses in California; andWHEREAS, The sport of disc golf is great for people of all socioeconomic classes, age groups, and demographics, provides a way to exercise and spend time outdoors, and provides a wide range of mental health benefits; andWHEREAS, Disc golf is a way to set attainable goals and work to achieve them, and to be part of a community of all ages and all abilities; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes the month of August 2023 as Disc Golf Month, and August 5, 2023, as California Disc Golf Day, recognizing the teamwork, physical, mental, and emotional well-being the sport provides; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled February 28, 2024 Passed IN Senate February 26, 2024 Passed IN Assembly September 05, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 115Introduced by Assembly Member Waldron(Coauthors: Assembly Members Addis, Aguiar-Curry, Alanis, Alvarez, Arambula, Bains, Bauer-Kahan, Bennett, Berman, Boerner, Bonta, Bryan, Calderon, Juan Carrillo, Wendy Carrillo, Cervantes, Chen, Connolly, Megan Dahle, Davies, Dixon, Essayli, Flora, Mike Fong, Vince Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Garcia, Gipson, Grayson, Haney, Hart, Holden, Hoover, Jackson, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Low, Lowenthal, Maienschein, Mathis, McCarty, McKinnor, Stephanie Nguyen, Ortega, Pacheco, Papan, Joe Patterson, Pellerin, Petrie-Norris, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Sanchez, Santiago, Schiavo, Soria, Ta, Ting, Valencia, Villapudua, Waldron, Wallis, Ward, Weber, Wicks, Wilson, Wood, and Zbur)August 23, 2023 Relative to disc golf. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 115, Waldron. Disc golf.This measure would recognize the month of August 2023 as Disc Golf Month, and August 5, 2023, as California Disc Golf Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, In the 1920s, the earliest known games of disc golf were played by children at Bladworth Elementary School in Saskatchewan, Canada; andWHEREAS, In 1965, George Sappenfield was attending California State University, Fresno, and working as a recreation counselor with a new idea of playing golf with Frisbees; andWHEREAS, On August 2, 1974, the American Flying Disc Open was launched and a group of avid golfers turned the City of Rochester Disc Golf Championship into a national tournament. They offered a prize for the winner to gain the attention of the Frisbee community; andWHEREAS, In 1975, the first official disc golf course was installed by American toy inventor Ed Headrick at Oak Grove Park in the City of Pasadena, California, where the targets are simply permanent poles; andWHEREAS, In 1976, the success of disc golf at the World Frisbee Championships suggested that this sport was the next big thing, and Ed Headrick created the Disc Golf Association (DGA). Even today, it functions as a leader in the sport; andWHEREAS, This sport is so popular and rapidly growing that there are 11,300 courses globally, with 75 percent of all disc golf courses being in the United States, and over 400 courses in California; andWHEREAS, The sport of disc golf is great for people of all socioeconomic classes, age groups, and demographics, provides a way to exercise and spend time outdoors, and provides a wide range of mental health benefits; andWHEREAS, Disc golf is a way to set attainable goals and work to achieve them, and to be part of a community of all ages and all abilities; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes the month of August 2023 as Disc Golf Month, and August 5, 2023, as California Disc Golf Day, recognizing the teamwork, physical, mental, and emotional well-being the sport provides; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|