03/28/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 18, Statutes of 2023. | |||
03/27/2023 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 03/16/2023 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 361.) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2023 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 458.) | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (February 17). | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2023 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2023 | Introduced. To print. |