1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 13 CHAPTER 18 Relative to California Science and Technology Week. [ Filed with Secretary of State March 27, 2023. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 13, Stephanie Nguyen. California Science and Technology Week.This bill would designate the week of February 13, 2023, to February 17, 2023, inclusive, as California Science and Technology Week.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The California Council on Science and Technology is celebrating 35 years of successfully providing scientific and technological expertise to the Legislature since its inception in 1988, established by Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 162 (Res. Ch. 148, Stats. 1988), when the Legislature foresaw the need for science-informed policy; andWHEREAS, California is the nations preeminent science and technology hub, producing new research and innovations every year; andWHEREAS, California is home to some of the nations most distinguished research and higher education institutions on the states behalf, including the University of California system, the California State University system, the California Community Colleges, the California Institute of Technology, Stanford University, the University of Southern California, NASAs Ames Research Center, NASAs Jet Propulsion Laboratory, Lawrence Berkeley National Laboratory, Lawrence Livermore National Laboratory, Sandia National Laboratories, and SLAC National Accelerator Laboratory. The California Council on Science and Technology was created as a unique, independent, nonpartisan organization dedicated to leveraging their expertise; andWHEREAS, The California Council on Science and Technology is fostering engagement with policymakers, scientific experts from academic and research institutions throughout California and beyond, and philanthropists through workshops, roundtables, reports, and expert briefings with in-state and national collaborators on disaster resilience initiatives; andWHEREAS, The council continues to uphold its charge of providing scientific expertise to the Legislature by hosting a variety of activities in the capitol designed to promote scientific understanding, bring to the forefront emerging technological innovations, and exchange expertise between California policymakers and the science and technology community; andWHEREAS, The council is also celebrating 15 years of the Science and Technology Policy Fellows program, in which the organization has deepened its partnership with the Legislature and the executive branch with the expansion of the program and new placements in both the legislative and executive branches; andWHEREAS, Official recognition of the importance and value of science and technology to California will enhance awareness and support for those activities; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the week of February 13, 2023, to February 17, 2023, inclusive, as California Science and Technology Week; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled March 17, 2023 Passed IN Senate March 16, 2023 Passed IN Assembly February 23, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 13Introduced by Assembly Member Stephanie Nguyen(Coauthors: Assembly Members Addis, Aguiar-Curry, Alanis, Alvarez, Arambula, Bains, Bauer-Kahan, Bennett, Berman, Boerner Horvath, Bryan, Calderon, Juan Carrillo, Wendy Carrillo, Cervantes, Chen, Connolly, Megan Dahle, Davies, Dixon, Essayli, Flora, Mike Fong, Vince Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Garcia, Gipson, Grayson, Haney, Hart, Holden, Hoover, Irwin, Jackson, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Lee, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, McCarty, McKinnor, Muratsuchi, Ortega, Pacheco, Papan, Jim Patterson, Joe Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Sanchez, Santiago, Schiavo, Soria, Ta, Ting, Valencia, Villapudua, Waldron, Wallis, Ward, Weber, Wicks, Wilson, Wood, and Zbur)February 13, 2023 Relative to California Science and Technology Week.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 13, Stephanie Nguyen. California Science and Technology Week.This bill would designate the week of February 13, 2023, to February 17, 2023, inclusive, as California Science and Technology Week.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The California Council on Science and Technology is celebrating 35 years of successfully providing scientific and technological expertise to the Legislature since its inception in 1988, established by Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 162 (Res. Ch. 148, Stats. 1988), when the Legislature foresaw the need for science-informed policy; andWHEREAS, California is the nations preeminent science and technology hub, producing new research and innovations every year; andWHEREAS, California is home to some of the nations most distinguished research and higher education institutions on the states behalf, including the University of California system, the California State University system, the California Community Colleges, the California Institute of Technology, Stanford University, the University of Southern California, NASAs Ames Research Center, NASAs Jet Propulsion Laboratory, Lawrence Berkeley National Laboratory, Lawrence Livermore National Laboratory, Sandia National Laboratories, and SLAC National Accelerator Laboratory. The California Council on Science and Technology was created as a unique, independent, nonpartisan organization dedicated to leveraging their expertise; andWHEREAS, The California Council on Science and Technology is fostering engagement with policymakers, scientific experts from academic and research institutions throughout California and beyond, and philanthropists through workshops, roundtables, reports, and expert briefings with in-state and national collaborators on disaster resilience initiatives; andWHEREAS, The council continues to uphold its charge of providing scientific expertise to the Legislature by hosting a variety of activities in the capitol designed to promote scientific understanding, bring to the forefront emerging technological innovations, and exchange expertise between California policymakers and the science and technology community; andWHEREAS, The council is also celebrating 15 years of the Science and Technology Policy Fellows program, in which the organization has deepened its partnership with the Legislature and the executive branch with the expansion of the program and new placements in both the legislative and executive branches; andWHEREAS, Official recognition of the importance and value of science and technology to California will enhance awareness and support for those activities; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the week of February 13, 2023, to February 17, 2023, inclusive, as California Science and Technology Week; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|