08/22/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 130, Statutes of 2023. | |||
08/22/2023 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 08/14/2023 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/14/2023 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2098.) | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2023 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 1010.) | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22). | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2023 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2023 | Introduced. To print. |