05/14/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 66, Statutes of 2024. | |||
05/14/2024 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 05/09/2024 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2024 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3876.) | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2024 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2024 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.) | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 15). | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2024 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2024 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2024 | Introduced. To print. |