1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 171 CHAPTER 66 Relative to Songkran New Year Festival. [ Filed with Secretary of State May 14, 2024. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 171, Low. Songkran New Year Festival.This measure would join Asian and Pacific Islander communities throughout the state, nation, and world in celebrating April 13, 2024, to April 15, 2024, as the Songkran New Year Festival.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, April 13, 2024, to April 15, 2024, will mark the celebration of Songkran, the traditional Thai New Year, which is also celebrated in Laos, Cambodia, Myanmar, by the Tai ethnic minority of Vietnam, and in the Yunnan province of China, as well as in Sri Lanka and other southeast Asian countries; andWHEREAS, Songkran was originally Thailands New Years Day, signifying the start of the Thai calendar; between 1888 and 1940, Songkran and New Years Day in Thailand was celebrated on April 1, but was later changed to April 13 to April 15, when January 1 became synchronized across the world as New Years Day; andWHEREAS, In Thailand, Songkran is one of Thailands most celebrated and iconic festivals. It is a time when people reunite with their families and pay their respects to older adults, ancestors, and sacred Buddha images. Pouring water is a ritual act during Songkran, symbolizing cleansing, reverence, and good fortune. Other activities include bathing important Buddha images, splashing water on family and friends, folk plays, games, music, and feasting; andWHEREAS, The United Nations Educational, Scientific and Cultural Organization (UNESCO) recognized the value and importance of Songkran as an Intangible Cultural Heritage of Humanity on December 6, 2023; andWHEREAS, The recognition of Songkran reflects Californias commitment to celebrating the rich and diverse culture of our Asian American and Pacific Islander communities; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature joins Asian and Pacific Islander communities throughout the state, nation, and world in celebrating April 13, 2024, to April 15, 2024, as the Songkran New Year Festival; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled May 10, 2024 Passed IN Senate May 09, 2024 Passed IN Assembly April 18, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 171Introduced by Assembly Member Low(Principal coauthors: Assembly Members Bains, Mike Fong, Kalra, Lee, Muratsuchi, Stephanie Nguyen, and Ting)(Principal coauthors: Senators Min and Wahab)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Addis, Aguiar-Curry, Alanis, Alvarez, Bauer-Kahan, Bennett, Berman, Calderon, Juan Carrillo, Wendy Carrillo, Chen, Connolly, Davies, Dixon, Flora, Vince Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Garcia, Gipson, Grayson, Haney, Hart, Holden, Hoover, Irwin, Jackson, Jones-Sawyer, Lackey, Lowenthal, Maienschein, McCarty, McKinnor, Ortega, Pacheco, Papan, Jim Patterson, Joe Patterson, Pellerin, Petrie-Norris, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Sanchez, Santiago, Schiavo, Soria, Ta, Valencia, Villapudua, Waldron, Wallis, Ward, Weber, Wicks, Wilson, Wood, and Zbur)April 09, 2024 Relative to Songkran New Year Festival. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 171, Low. Songkran New Year Festival.This measure would join Asian and Pacific Islander communities throughout the state, nation, and world in celebrating April 13, 2024, to April 15, 2024, as the Songkran New Year Festival.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, April 13, 2024, to April 15, 2024, will mark the celebration of Songkran, the traditional Thai New Year, which is also celebrated in Laos, Cambodia, Myanmar, by the Tai ethnic minority of Vietnam, and in the Yunnan province of China, as well as in Sri Lanka and other southeast Asian countries; andWHEREAS, Songkran was originally Thailands New Years Day, signifying the start of the Thai calendar; between 1888 and 1940, Songkran and New Years Day in Thailand was celebrated on April 1, but was later changed to April 13 to April 15, when January 1 became synchronized across the world as New Years Day; andWHEREAS, In Thailand, Songkran is one of Thailands most celebrated and iconic festivals. It is a time when people reunite with their families and pay their respects to older adults, ancestors, and sacred Buddha images. Pouring water is a ritual act during Songkran, symbolizing cleansing, reverence, and good fortune. Other activities include bathing important Buddha images, splashing water on family and friends, folk plays, games, music, and feasting; andWHEREAS, The United Nations Educational, Scientific and Cultural Organization (UNESCO) recognized the value and importance of Songkran as an Intangible Cultural Heritage of Humanity on December 6, 2023; andWHEREAS, The recognition of Songkran reflects Californias commitment to celebrating the rich and diverse culture of our Asian American and Pacific Islander communities; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature joins Asian and Pacific Islander communities throughout the state, nation, and world in celebrating April 13, 2024, to April 15, 2024, as the Songkran New Year Festival; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|