California 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR171 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 05/14/2024

                    Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 171 CHAPTER 66 Relative to Songkran New Year Festival.  [ Filed with  Secretary of State  May 14, 2024. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 171, Low. Songkran New Year Festival.This measure would join Asian and Pacific Islander communities throughout the state, nation, and world in celebrating April 13, 2024, to April 15, 2024, as the Songkran New Year Festival.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, April 13, 2024, to April 15, 2024, will mark the celebration of Songkran, the traditional Thai New Year, which is also celebrated in Laos, Cambodia, Myanmar, by the Tai ethnic minority of Vietnam, and in the Yunnan province of China, as well as in Sri Lanka and other southeast Asian countries; andWHEREAS, Songkran was originally Thailands New Years Day, signifying the start of the Thai calendar; between 1888 and 1940, Songkran and New Years Day in Thailand was celebrated on April 1, but was later changed to April 13 to April 15, when January 1 became synchronized across the world as New Years Day; andWHEREAS, In Thailand, Songkran is one of Thailands most celebrated and iconic festivals. It is a time when people reunite with their families and pay their respects to older adults, ancestors, and sacred Buddha images. Pouring water is a ritual act during Songkran, symbolizing cleansing, reverence, and good fortune. Other activities include bathing important Buddha images, splashing water on family and friends, folk plays, games, music, and feasting; andWHEREAS, The United Nations Educational, Scientific and Cultural Organization (UNESCO) recognized the value and importance of Songkran as an Intangible Cultural Heritage of Humanity on December 6, 2023; andWHEREAS, The recognition of Songkran reflects Californias commitment to celebrating the rich and diverse culture of our Asian American and Pacific Islander communities; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature joins Asian and Pacific Islander communities throughout the state, nation, and world in celebrating April 13, 2024, to April 15, 2024, as the Songkran New Year Festival; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 171 CHAPTER 66 Relative to Songkran New Year Festival.  [ Filed with  Secretary of State  May 14, 2024. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 171, Low. Songkran New Year Festival.This measure would join Asian and Pacific Islander communities throughout the state, nation, and world in celebrating April 13, 2024, to April 15, 2024, as the Songkran New Year Festival.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO 

 Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 171 CHAPTER 66

 Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 171

 CHAPTER 66

 Relative to Songkran New Year Festival. 

 [ Filed with  Secretary of State  May 14, 2024. ] 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

ACR 171, Low. Songkran New Year Festival.

This measure would join Asian and Pacific Islander communities throughout the state, nation, and world in celebrating April 13, 2024, to April 15, 2024, as the Songkran New Year Festival.

This measure would join Asian and Pacific Islander communities throughout the state, nation, and world in celebrating April 13, 2024, to April 15, 2024, as the Songkran New Year Festival.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, April 13, 2024, to April 15, 2024, will mark the celebration of Songkran, the traditional Thai New Year, which is also celebrated in Laos, Cambodia, Myanmar, by the Tai ethnic minority of Vietnam, and in the Yunnan province of China, as well as in Sri Lanka and other southeast Asian countries; and

WHEREAS, Songkran was originally Thailands New Years Day, signifying the start of the Thai calendar; between 1888 and 1940, Songkran and New Years Day in Thailand was celebrated on April 1, but was later changed to April 13 to April 15, when January 1 became synchronized across the world as New Years Day; and

WHEREAS, In Thailand, Songkran is one of Thailands most celebrated and iconic festivals. It is a time when people reunite with their families and pay their respects to older adults, ancestors, and sacred Buddha images. Pouring water is a ritual act during Songkran, symbolizing cleansing, reverence, and good fortune. Other activities include bathing important Buddha images, splashing water on family and friends, folk plays, games, music, and feasting; and

WHEREAS, The United Nations Educational, Scientific and Cultural Organization (UNESCO) recognized the value and importance of Songkran as an Intangible Cultural Heritage of Humanity on December 6, 2023; and

WHEREAS, The recognition of Songkran reflects Californias commitment to celebrating the rich and diverse culture of our Asian American and Pacific Islander communities; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature joins Asian and Pacific Islander communities throughout the state, nation, and world in celebrating April 13, 2024, to April 15, 2024, as the Songkran New Year Festival; and be it further

Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.