08/19/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 167, Statutes of 2024. | |||
08/19/2024 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 08/13/2024 | Enrolled measure version corrected. | ||
Assembly | 08/08/2024 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/08/2024 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.) | ||
Senate | 08/06/2024 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 07/03/2024 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2024 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/24/2024 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 5989.) | ||
Assembly | 06/24/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/17/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 17). | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | Introduced. To print. |