06/09/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 90, Statutes of 2023. | |||
06/09/2023 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1413.) | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2023 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 1525.) | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 4). | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2023 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2023 | Introduced. To print. |