1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 39 CHAPTER 90 Relative to Older Californians Month. [ Filed with Secretary of State June 09, 2023. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 39, Bains. Older Californians Month.This bill would recognize the month of May 2023 as Older Californians Month and would encourage Californians of all ages to recognize and treat all older adults with compassion and respect, and to participate in services and activities that contribute to the health and well-being of older adults.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Older adults reflect the history, strength, potential, and wisdom of the Golden State; and WHEREAS, The California Department of Aging, the California Commission on Aging, and the California Senior Legislature have worked for decades to elevate and prioritize policies advancing topics such as equity, affordability, health, housing, transportation, workforce, community engagement, volunteerism, employment, and services that support and promote independence; and WHEREAS, It is important to acknowledge the invaluable contributions older adults have made, and continue to make, in our communities to foster inclusivity, belonging, diversity, and cultural competency; andWHEREAS, Elder and disability justice assures the right to equitable treatment of older adults and people with disabilities in all aspects of life; andWHEREAS, Older adults are the fastest growing population in California. Thousands of Californians turn 65 years of age each day and the number of Californians older than 60 years of age is due to increase from 9.45 million individuals to over 11 million individuals roughly one in four Californians by the year 2030; andWHEREAS, The next generation of older Californians will be significantly more diverse, will live longer, and will contribute in untold new ways to making our state a more vibrant place; andWHEREAS, Diverse Californians will make up over one-half of Californias older adult population by the year 2035, with the Latinx and Asian-Pacific Islander communities making up the fastest growing racial and ethnic older adult populations; andWHEREAS, Women make up the majority of both Californias older adults and family caregivers; andWHEREAS, The State of California is prioritizing its older adults with the Governors Master Plan for Aging issued via Executive Order No. N-14-19 that aims to create streamlined access to care, a well-trained and culturally competent workforce, and a commitment to ensuring older adults may age in their communities with dignity; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature of the State of California recognizes the month of May 2023 as Older Californians Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature encourages Californians of all ages to recognize and treat all older adults with compassion and respect, and to participate in services and activities that contribute to the health and well-being of older adults and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled June 02, 2023 Passed IN Senate June 01, 2023 Passed IN Assembly May 11, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 39Introduced by Assembly Member Bains(Coauthors: Assembly Members Addis, Aguiar-Curry, Alanis, Bennett, Berman, Boerner, Bryan, Calderon, Wendy Carrillo, Chen, Connolly, Megan Dahle, Davies, Essayli, Flora, Mike Fong, Vince Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Garcia, Gipson, Grayson, Haney, Holden, Hoover, Irwin, Jackson, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Low, Lowenthal, Maienschein, Mathis, McKinnor, Stephanie Nguyen, Pacheco, Joe Patterson, Pellerin, Petrie-Norris, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Sanchez, Santiago, Schiavo, Soria, Ta, Ting, Valencia, Villapudua, Waldron, Wallis, Weber, Wicks, Wilson, and Zbur)March 13, 2023 Relative to Older Californians Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 39, Bains. Older Californians Month.This bill would recognize the month of May 2023 as Older Californians Month and would encourage Californians of all ages to recognize and treat all older adults with compassion and respect, and to participate in services and activities that contribute to the health and well-being of older adults.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Older adults reflect the history, strength, potential, and wisdom of the Golden State; and WHEREAS, The California Department of Aging, the California Commission on Aging, and the California Senior Legislature have worked for decades to elevate and prioritize policies advancing topics such as equity, affordability, health, housing, transportation, workforce, community engagement, volunteerism, employment, and services that support and promote independence; and WHEREAS, It is important to acknowledge the invaluable contributions older adults have made, and continue to make, in our communities to foster inclusivity, belonging, diversity, and cultural competency; andWHEREAS, Elder and disability justice assures the right to equitable treatment of older adults and people with disabilities in all aspects of life; andWHEREAS, Older adults are the fastest growing population in California. Thousands of Californians turn 65 years of age each day and the number of Californians older than 60 years of age is due to increase from 9.45 million individuals to over 11 million individuals roughly one in four Californians by the year 2030; andWHEREAS, The next generation of older Californians will be significantly more diverse, will live longer, and will contribute in untold new ways to making our state a more vibrant place; andWHEREAS, Diverse Californians will make up over one-half of Californias older adult population by the year 2035, with the Latinx and Asian-Pacific Islander communities making up the fastest growing racial and ethnic older adult populations; andWHEREAS, Women make up the majority of both Californias older adults and family caregivers; andWHEREAS, The State of California is prioritizing its older adults with the Governors Master Plan for Aging issued via Executive Order No. N-14-19 that aims to create streamlined access to care, a well-trained and culturally competent workforce, and a commitment to ensuring older adults may age in their communities with dignity; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature of the State of California recognizes the month of May 2023 as Older Californians Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature encourages Californians of all ages to recognize and treat all older adults with compassion and respect, and to participate in services and activities that contribute to the health and well-being of older adults and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|