09/14/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 166, Statutes of 2023. | |||
09/14/2023 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 09/07/2023 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/07/2023 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2474.) | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2023 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 1848.) | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 18). | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | Introduced. To print. |