1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 80 CHAPTER 166 Relative to Small Business Month. [ Filed with Secretary of State September 14, 2023. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 80, Villapudua. California Small Business Month.This measure would declare May as California Small Business Month and express the Legislatures support of the Governors efforts in promoting small businesses.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, California is home to the most innovative and competitive firms in the world, placing the state consistently among the top 10 economies; andWHEREAS, Small businesses embody the entrepreneurial spirit that has driven the economy of our state where over one-half of our private sector workforce is employed by small businesses; andWHEREAS, In 2022, there were over 4,000,000 small businesses in this state, representing an overwhelming share of Californias workforce by employing more than 7,000,000 people; andWHEREAS, The 73,500 small firms that exported goods from California generated 43.2 percent of the states $152.1 billion in total exports; andWHEREAS, On a national basis, the 30,000,000 small businesses are responsible for creating nearly two out of three new jobs; andWHEREAS, Small businesses are critical to the economic well-being of this state by creating new businesses and employment opportunities and by bringing new and innovative services and products to the marketplace; andWHEREAS, Within the small business community, a growing number of these companies are being started and owned by women, people of color, and immigrants. In 2022, it was estimated that 1,600,000 small businesses were minority owned; and WHEREAS, The Legislature reaffirms our commitment to Californias small businesses to thrive and prosper and that supporting small-scale private sector job creators is among our most promising strategies to enhance Californias human capital, expand job opportunities, and increase our competitive advantage in the global marketplace; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature in recognition of the importance of small businesses to the economy of this state declares May as California Small Business Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature adds its support to the Governors efforts in promoting small businesses. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled September 11, 2023 Passed IN Senate September 07, 2023 Passed IN Assembly May 26, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 80Introduced by Assembly Member Villapudua(Coauthors: Assembly Members Addis, Aguiar-Curry, Alanis, Alvarez, Arambula, Bains, Bauer-Kahan, Bennett, Berman, Boerner, Bonta, Bryan, Calderon, Juan Carrillo, Cervantes, Chen, Connolly, Megan Dahle, Davies, Dixon, Flora, Mike Fong, Vince Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Garcia, Gipson, Grayson, Haney, Hart, Holden, Hoover, Irwin, Jackson, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Lee, Low, Lowenthal, Maienschein, Mathis, McCarty, McKinnor, Muratsuchi, Stephanie Nguyen, Ortega, Pacheco, Papan, Jim Patterson, Joe Patterson, Pellerin, Petrie-Norris, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Sanchez, Santiago, Schiavo, Soria, Ta, Ting, Valencia, Waldron, Wallis, Ward, Weber, Wicks, Wilson, Wood, and Zbur)May 16, 2023 Relative to Small Business Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 80, Villapudua. California Small Business Month.This measure would declare May as California Small Business Month and express the Legislatures support of the Governors efforts in promoting small businesses.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, California is home to the most innovative and competitive firms in the world, placing the state consistently among the top 10 economies; andWHEREAS, Small businesses embody the entrepreneurial spirit that has driven the economy of our state where over one-half of our private sector workforce is employed by small businesses; andWHEREAS, In 2022, there were over 4,000,000 small businesses in this state, representing an overwhelming share of Californias workforce by employing more than 7,000,000 people; andWHEREAS, The 73,500 small firms that exported goods from California generated 43.2 percent of the states $152.1 billion in total exports; andWHEREAS, On a national basis, the 30,000,000 small businesses are responsible for creating nearly two out of three new jobs; andWHEREAS, Small businesses are critical to the economic well-being of this state by creating new businesses and employment opportunities and by bringing new and innovative services and products to the marketplace; andWHEREAS, Within the small business community, a growing number of these companies are being started and owned by women, people of color, and immigrants. In 2022, it was estimated that 1,600,000 small businesses were minority owned; and WHEREAS, The Legislature reaffirms our commitment to Californias small businesses to thrive and prosper and that supporting small-scale private sector job creators is among our most promising strategies to enhance Californias human capital, expand job opportunities, and increase our competitive advantage in the global marketplace; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature in recognition of the importance of small businesses to the economy of this state declares May as California Small Business Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature adds its support to the Governors efforts in promoting small businesses. |
---|