07/17/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 123, Statutes of 2023. | |||
07/17/2023 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 07/10/2023 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 07/10/2023 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1959.) | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 13). | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2023 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 1004.) | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2023 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2023 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 28). | ||
Assembly | 03/27/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2023 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2023 | Introduced. To print. |