California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AJR1 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill July 11, 2023

Chaptered

Bill July 17, 2023

Amended

Bill March 29, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023