|
09/05/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 201, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2024
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2024
|
Enrolled measure version corrected.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2024
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4489.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/29/2024
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/29/2024
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2024
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (February 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2024
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/25/2024
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|