California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AJR12 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 5, 2024

Amended

Bill May 29, 2024
Bill February 16, 2024
Bill February 13, 2024