08/23/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 179, Statutes of 2024. | |||
08/23/2024 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 08/15/2024 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/15/2024 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0.) | ||
Senate | 08/13/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 13). | ||
Senate | 08/07/2024 | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | ||
Senate | 08/06/2024 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/05/2024 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 6199.) | ||
Assembly | 08/05/2024 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0.) | ||
Assembly | 08/05/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 1). | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | Referred to Com. on U. & E. | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2024 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2024 | Introduced. To print. |