Assembly | 04/11/2024 | Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Essayli. | ||
04/11/2024 | Assembly refused to concur in Senate amendments. (Ayes 31. Noes 0.) | |||
Assembly | 04/08/2024 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3509.) | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 2). | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Referred to Com. on PUB S. | ||
Senate | 09/15/2023 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 09/14/2023 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 3587.) | ||
Assembly | 09/13/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (September 13). | ||
Assembly | 09/12/2023 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3322.) | ||
Assembly | 08/15/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 08/14/2023 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2023 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2023 | Introduced. To print. |